Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino (Antonio) della Chiesa, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Peking [Beijing], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1644Born
16 Aug 166319.2ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
167126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
20 Mar 168035.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
20 Mar 168035.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
31 Mar 168035.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
29 Oct 168440.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
10 Apr 169045.9AppointedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
21 Dec 172177.6DiedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China

MicroData Summary for Bernardino (Antonio) della Chiesa
Bishop Bernardino (Antonio) della Chiesa O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Peking [Beijing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLinqing

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98, and Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 11
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 30 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast