Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)

Eparchia Crisiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Milan Stipić, Bishop
  • Nikola Nino Kekić, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci)
Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
17 June 1777ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci) Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
1914Territory LostEparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci) Apostolic Administration of Bosnia-Hercegovina (Ukrainian) (erected)
1925Territory AddedApostolic Administration of Bosnia-Hercegovina (Ukrainian) (suppressed) Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
11 January 2001Territory LostEparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci) Apostolic Exarchate of Macedonia (Macedonian) (erected)
28 August 2003Territory LostEparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci) Apostolic Exarchate of Serbia e Montenegro (Križevci) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
195055,00015,000,000.4%5846288725550ap1951
196962,000573601,03359342ap1971
198048,680582608111411257ap1981
199048,870602627881411257ap1991
199948,77561263774211150ap2000
200048,90561263776211150ap2001
200142,5795215380319345ap2002
200237,17458462599411553ap2003
200342,603584626873411553ap2004
200415,3113623840226034ap2005
200921,50928287685844ap2010
201321,27033336444746ap2014
201621,12144444804146ap2017
201921,000474744613146ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast