Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milan Stipić

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1978 Born
8 Nov 200223.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
18 Oct 200324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
18 Mar 201940.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
8 Sep 202041.6AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
17 Oct 202041.8Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Milan Stipić (VIAF: 305544104)
Bishop Milan Stipić (born ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosanski Novi
Ordained DeaconSaints Cyril and Methodius, Co-Cathedral, Zagreb, Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
Ordained PriestHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Križevci, Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Križevci, Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 10 Jun 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2020
  • loc: CB, 8 Sep 2020
  • ob: CB, 14 Sep 2020
  • c2+: CB, 13 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast