Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislav Hučko

Apostolic Exarch of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Horaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1948 Born
30 Mar 199648.1Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
24 Apr 200355.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
24 Apr 200355.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Horaea
31 May 200355.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horaea

MicroData Summary for Ladislav Hučko (VIAF: 162612428)
Bishop Ladislav Hučko (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Czech Republic

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrešov, Slovakia
Ordained BishopSaint Sauveur, Church, Praha

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Czech Republic (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,402
  • opd: CB, 27 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast