Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomo Vukšić

Coadjutor Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1954 Born
3 Dec 197925.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
29 Jun 198026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
1 Feb 201157.0AppointedBishop of Bosnia and Herzegovina, Military
2 Apr 201157.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia and Herzegovina, Military
22 Jan 202066.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Tomo Vukšić
Archbishop Tomo Vukšić (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStudenci
Ordained BishopMarije Majke Crkve, Cathedral, Mostar, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,982
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast