Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ratko Perić

Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1944 Born
29 Jun 196925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
29 May 199248.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
14 Sep 199248.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
24 Jul 199349.4SucceededBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
11 Jul 202076.4RetiredBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Ratko Perić
Bishop Ratko Perić (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuk-Rovišce
Ordained BishopMary, Mother of God, Cathedral, Mostar, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,792
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast