Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Snyder

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1925Born
9 Jun 195125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
13 Dec 197247.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
13 Dec 197247.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
2 Feb 197347.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
2 Oct 197953.9AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
5 Dec 197954.1InstalledBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
12 Dec 200075.1RetiredBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
27 Sep 201993.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Snyder
Bishop John Joseph Snyder (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Basilica, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Death PlaceHospice, Jacksonville, FL
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo Catholic, Cemetery, St. Augustine, Diocese of Saint Augustine, Florida

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,085
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast