Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Edmund Molloy

Deceased

Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1884Born
19 Sep 190824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 192035.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 192035.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorea
3 Oct 192036.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lorea
21 Nov 192137.2AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Feb 192237.4InstalledBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
7 Apr 195166.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brooklyn, New York, USA
26 Nov 195672.2DiedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Edmund Molloy
(WikiData: Q7789254)
Archbishop Thomas Edmund Molloy (born , died ) Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNashua, NH, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint James, Pro-Cathedral, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Death PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 93
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 459, Ascendance
  • c1: CB, 12 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 21 Jul 2024