Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Baker

Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1944 Born
21 Mar 197025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
12 Jul 199955.1AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
29 Sep 199955.3Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
14 Aug 200763.1AppointedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
2 Oct 200763.3InstalledBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
25 Mar 202075.8RetiredBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Baker
Bishop Robert Joseph Baker (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWillard, OH
Ordained BishopConvention and Performing Arts Center, North Charleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,624
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast