Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Marie Aimé Marius Fonlupt

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1954 Born
25 Mar 197924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
2 Apr 201156.2AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
5 Jun 201156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
11 Jun 202166.4AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
11 Jul 202166.5InstalledArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for François Marie Aimé Marius Fonlupt
Archbishop François Marie Aimé Marius Fonlupt (born ) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllègre, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rodez, Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Avignon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,072
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast