Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude Feidt

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1936Born
29 Jun 196125.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
24 Dec 196125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
5 Jul 198044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
5 Jul 198044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
13 Sep 198044.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
16 Feb 198548.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
14 May 198549.1SucceededArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
17 Jun 199963.2AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
29 Mar 201074.0ResignedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles), France
13 Oct 202084.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles), France

MicroData Summary for Claude Feidt (VIAF: 227054165)
Archbishop Claude Feidt (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAudun-le-Roman, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Le Puy-en-Velay, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained PriestSaint-Pierre des Carmes, Church, Le Puy-en-Velay, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Le Puy-en-Velay, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Death PlaceEmile-Roux, Hospital, Le Puy-en-Velay, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Buried Place (Original)Tombe des évêques, Saint-Sauveur, Cathedral, Aix-en-Provence, Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles)

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,995
  • d: CB, 14 Oct 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast