Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Albert Schlaefer Berg, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Flumenpiscense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1920Born
5 Jun 194625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Jun 197049.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
25 Jun 197049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
12 Aug 197050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
22 Oct 199373.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Salvador Albert Schlaefer Berg
Bishop Salvador Albert Schlaefer Berg O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampbellsport, WI, USA
Ordained BishopBluefields, Vicariate Apostolic of Bluefields

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast