Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Albin Zywiec Sidor, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Siuna, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1947Born
1 Sep 196619.1First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Sep 197124.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Jun 197426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jun 200254.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
24 Jun 200254.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
13 Sep 200255.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
30 Nov 201770.3AppointedBishop of Siuna, Nicaragua
13 Jan 201870.4InstalledBishop of Siuna, Nicaragua
5 Jan 202072.4DiedBishop of Siuna, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for David Albin Zywiec Sidor
Bishop David Albin Zywiec Sidor O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Siuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast Chicago, IN, USA
Ordained PriestSt. Francis, Church, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosario, Cathedral, Bluefields, Vicariate Apostolic of Bluefields
Death PlaceMilitary, Hospital, Managua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,250
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017
  • i: CB, 13 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • qfmc/d: CB, 5 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast