Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Carranza y López

Deceased

Bishop of Esteli, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1905Born
12 Mar 193226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
12 Jan 196357.1AppointedBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
19 Mar 196357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
7 Feb 197872.2DiedBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Clemente Carranza y López
Bishop Clemente Carranza y López (born , died ) Bishop of Esteli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNandasmo
Ordained BishopManagua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast