Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Guillén Soto, S.D.B.

Bishop of Gracias, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1961 Born
6 Jun 198624.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Nov 198826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Nov 202058.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
14 Nov 202058.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
27 Apr 202159.3AppointedBishop of Gracias, Honduras
11 Jun 202159.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gracias, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Walter Guillén Soto
Bishop Walter Guillén Soto S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Gracias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro Sula, Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula
Ordained BishopSan Marcos, Cathedral, Gracias, Diocese of Gracias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gracias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2021
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast