Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles-Henri-Joseph Cardinal Binet

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1869Born
22 Oct 189324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Soissons (-Laon), France
16 Jun 192051.1AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
24 Aug 192051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
31 Oct 192758.5AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
31 Oct 192758.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
19 Dec 192758.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 192758.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
1 May 192859.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
15 Jul 193667.2DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Henri-Joseph Binet (VIAF: 49216486)
Charles-Henri-Joseph Cardinal Binet (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuvigny
Ordained BishopCathedral, Soissons, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 54
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 559, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast