Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gustave-Maximilien-Juste Cardinal de Cro˙-Solre

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1773Born
3 Nov 179724.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181744.2SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
23 Aug 181945.9ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
9 Jan 182046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
17 Jul 182349.8SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
17 Nov 182350.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
21 Mar 182551.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 182955.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
1 Jan 184470.3DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Maximilien-Juste de Cro˙-Solre (VIAF: 89060794)
Gustave-Maximilien-Juste Cardinal de Cro˙-Solre (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVieux-Condé
Ordained BishopSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Buried Place (Original)Chapelle de la Vierge, Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88, and Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 2
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Mar 1825
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,089, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast