Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Emile Freppel

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1827Born
22 Dec 184922.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 187042.6SelectedBishop of Angers, France
21 Mar 187042.8ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
18 Apr 187042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
22 Dec 189164.5DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Emile Freppel (VIAF: 59082653)
Bishop Charles-Emile Freppel (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObernai
Ordained BishopSt. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast