Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Charles de Coucy

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1746Born
16 Aug 178942.8SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
14 Dec 178943.2ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
3 Jan 179043.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
1816²69.2ResignedBishop of La Rochelle, France
9 Sep 181770.9SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
1 Oct 181771.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
9 Mar 182477.4DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles de Coucy
Archbishop Jean-Charles de Coucy (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEcordal
Ordained BishopSéminaire Saint-Sulpice, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 360
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,089, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast