Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernabé de Jesús Sagastume Lemus, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of San Marcos, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1961 Born
28 Dec 198524.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
31 Jan 198725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Jul 200746.1AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala
6 Oct 200746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala
11 Jan 202159.6AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
25 Mar 202159.8InstalledBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Bernabé de Jesús Sagastume Lemus
Bishop Bernabé de Jesús Sagastume Lemus O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of San Marcos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Esteban, Diocese of Zacapa
Ordained BishopEstade de football, Santa Rosa, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Marcos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,550
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast