Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Braulio Rodríguez Plaza

Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1944 Born
3 Apr 197228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
6 Nov 198743.7AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
20 Dec 198743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
12 May 199551.2AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Aug 200258.5AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
13 Oct 200258.7InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
16 Apr 200965.2AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Jun 200965.4InstalledArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Dec 201975.9RetiredArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Braulio Rodríguez Plaza
Archbishop Braulio Rodríguez Plaza (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldea del Fresno
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgo de Osma, Diocese of Osma-Soria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Toledo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,519
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast