Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Blaize Rego

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1921Born
5 Dec 195332.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 197149.5AppointedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
11 Sep 197150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
10 Nov 199978.1RetiredBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
21 Jun 201290.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh, India

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Blaize Rego
Bishop Gilbert Blaize Rego (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMumbai
Ordained BishopChandigarh, Diocese of Error [smil]

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast