Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Allahabad

Dioecesis Allahabadensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Agra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 46,774 (18,066 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofallahabad.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 32 Thornhill Road, Allahabad-211002, U.P., India
  • Telephone: (0532)240.74.51

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Patna
1845ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan Vicariate Apostolic of Patna (erected)
Diocese of Allahabad
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Patna Diocese of Allahabad
1892Territory LostDiocese of Allahabad Prefecture Apostolic of Bettiah (erected)
18 July 1932Territory LostDiocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Jubbulpore (erected)
11 March 1935Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer
Diocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore (erected)
12 January 1940Territory LostDiocese of Allahabad Prefecture Apostolic of Jhansi (erected)
12 January 1940Territory LostArchdiocese of Agra
Diocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Lucknow (erected)
11 July 1946Territory LostDiocese of Allahabad Prefecture Apostolic of Gorakhpur (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Allahabad
19596,37310,000,000.1%3464015951214ap1960
19708,08511,000,000.1%50858139922334ap1971
19806,97316,274,000.0%63117494832865ap1981
19908,80221,495,810.0%661076115533125ap1991
199911,71525,914,016.0%691281144263109ap2000
200012,23126,231,226.0%701282149273029ap2001
200112,44226,892,327.0%7012821512630513ap2002
200212,70426,995,468.0%7410841512230113ap2003
200312,54027,123,504.0%7211831512335633ap2004
200412,56626,232,500.0%748821532936835ap2005
200612,76730,800,000.0%7711881452138335ap2007
201213,52532,644,000.0%7513881533335339ap2013
201513,99241,517,000.0%7513881594039839ap2016
201813,98742,611,355.0%7312851644241739ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast