Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emílio Pignoli

Bishop Emeritus of Campo Limpo, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1932 Born
29 Jun 195724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Apr 197643.3AppointedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Jun 197643.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Mar 198956.2AppointedBishop of Campo Limpo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Jul 200875.6RetiredBishop of Campo Limpo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Emílio Pignoli
Bishop Emílio Pignoli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Campo Limpo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCappella Piccenardi, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Orlandia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campo Limpo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,241
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast