Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Bergamin, C.R.L.

Bishop Emeritus of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1944 Born
2 Oct 196016.4ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
10 Apr 196924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
5 Apr 200055.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Apr 200055.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Octabia
20 May 200056.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octabia
24 Jul 200258.2AppointedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 May 201975.0RetiredBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luciano Bergamin
Bishop Luciano Bergamin C.R.L. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nova Iguaçu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoria, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained BishopSantuário Terço Bizantino, Brooklin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nova Iguaçu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,770
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast