Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosalvo Cordeiro de Lima

Bishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1962 Born
1 Nov 199230.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Feb 201149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
2 Feb 201149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
25 Mar 201149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
7 Oct 202058.7AppointedBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
5 Dec 202058.8InstalledBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rosalvo Cordeiro de Lima
Bishop Rosalvo Cordeiro de Lima (born ) Bishop of Itapipoca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnião dos Palmares, Archdiocese of Maceió, Alagoas
Ordained BishopClube Nautico Mogiano, Mogi das Cruzes, Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapipoca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,975
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast