Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William David O’Brien

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Archbishop of Calynda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1878Born
11 Jul 190324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Feb 193455.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Feb 193455.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
25 Apr 193455.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calynda
18 Nov 195375.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Calynda
19 Feb 196283.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for William David O’Brien
Bishop William David O’Brien (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast