Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Carroll

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1735Born
7 Sep 175318.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
14 Feb 176126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Jun 178449.4AppointedPrefect of United States of America
6 Nov 178954.8AppointedBishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
15 Aug 179055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
12 Dec 179055.9InstalledBishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
1 Sep 180570.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
8 Apr 180873.2AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Dec 181580.9DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for John Carroll (VIAF: 810019)
Archbishop John Carroll (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUpper Marlboro, MD
Ordained BishopLolworth, Castle, Dorset
Death PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Buried Place (Original)Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • prof: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 354
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast