Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Philip Kalisz, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wewak, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1927Born
15 Aug 195426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
24 Apr 198052.5AppointedBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
15 Aug 198052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
14 Aug 200274.8RetiredBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
12 Dec 201083.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Wewak, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Raymond Philip Kalisz
Bishop Raymond Philip Kalisz S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wewak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelvindale, MI, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan, USA
Ordained BishopWewak, Diocese of Wewak

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast