Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mark McShea

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1907Born
6 Dec 193124.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 195244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Feb 195244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
19 Mar 195245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina
11 Feb 196153.9AppointedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Apr 196154.1InstalledBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Feb 198375.9RetiredBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Nov 199184.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mark McShea
Bishop Joseph Mark McShea (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allentown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLattimer Mines
Ordained BishopCathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast