Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugene Martin Nugent

Apostolic Nuncio to Kuwait

Titular Archbishop of Domnach Sechnaill

Apostolic Nuncio to Bahrain

Apostolic Nuncio to Qatar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1958 Born
9 Jul 198324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Killaloe, Ireland
13 Feb 201051.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Domnach Sechnaill
13 Feb 201051.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Madagascar
13 Feb 201051.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Comoros
13 Mar 201051.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritius
13 Mar 201051.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
18 Mar 201051.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Domnach Sechnaill
10 Jan 201556.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
7 Jan 202162.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
7 Jan 202162.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Qatar
11 Feb 202162.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahrain

MicroData Summary for Eugene Martin Nugent
Archbishop Eugene Martin Nugent (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Kuwait

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGortaderra Scariff, Ireland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kuwait.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,588
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast