Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Anthony Harty

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1922Born
23 Jun 194624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Killaloe, Ireland
28 Sep 196745.6AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
19 Nov 196745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
8 Aug 199472.5DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Anthony Harty
Bishop Michael Anthony Harty (born , died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToomevara
Ordained PriestMaynooth, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast