Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franklyn (Frank) Atese Nubuasah, S.V.D.

Bishop of Gaborone, Botswana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1949 Born
26 Jul 198031.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
27 Jun 199848.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Francistown, Botswana
27 Jun 199848.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
7 Nov 199849.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera
9 Aug 201768.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gaborone, Botswana
2 Oct 201768.2AppointedBishop of Francistown, Botswana
6 Jun 201969.9AppointedBishop of Gaborone, Botswana
17 Aug 201970.1InstalledBishop of Gaborone, Botswana

MicroData Summary for Franklyn (Frank) Atese Nubuasah
Bishop Franklyn (Frank) Atese Nubuasah S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Gaborone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLikpe Abozome, Ghana
Ordained Bishopopen air, Francistown, Vicariate Apostolic of Francistown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gaborone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,445
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Aug 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2019
  • i: CB, 14 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast