Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Tng Cương

Deceased

Bishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1919Born
3 Dec 194930.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 197959.2AppointedBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
18 Feb 197959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
10 Feb 199979.3DiedBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyễn Tng Cương
Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Tng Cương (born , died ) Bishop of Hải Phng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHa Ni, Archdiocese of H Nội
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ha Ni, Archdiocese of H Nội

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast