Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Trịnh Chnh Trực

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1925Born
31 May 195428.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 198155.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
15 Aug 198155.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
4 Aug 199064.7SucceededBishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
29 Dec 200075.1RetiredBishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
23 Sep 201185.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Trịnh Chnh Trực
Bishop Joseph Trịnh Chnh Trực (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ban M Thuột

EventPlace
Birth PlaceH Hi, Vicariate Apostolic of H Ni
Ordained BishopBan M Thuột, Diocese of Ban M Thuột

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: L'Osservatore Romano (Italian), 24 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,926

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast