Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franois Xavier Nguyễn Văn Sang

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1932Born
18 Apr 195826.2Ordained PriestPriest of H Nội, Viet Nam
24 Mar 198149.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
24 Mar 198149.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarda
22 Apr 198149.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarda
May 199058.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
3 Dec 199058.9AppointedBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
25 Jul 200977.5RetiredBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
5 Oct 201785.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Franois Xavier Nguyễn Văn Sang
Bishop Franois Xavier Nguyễn Văn Sang (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Thi Bnh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceH Ni, Archdiocese of H Nội
Ordained BishopH Ni, Archdiocese of H Nội
Death PlaceThi Bnh, Diocese of Thi Bnh

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • d: CB, 5 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast