Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tng Nguyễn B

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1868Born
19 Sep 189628.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 193364.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
10 Jan 193364.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
11 Jun 193364.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
20 Oct 193567.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
8 Jun 194576.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
11 Jul 194980.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Tng Nguyễn B
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tng Nguyễn B (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGocong

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1933, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast