Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Phan Thế Hinh

Deceased

Bishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1928Born
13 Sep 195930.8Ordained PriestPriest of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
14 Apr 197647.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
14 Apr 197647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
14 Nov 197648.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
14 Nov 198557.0SucceededBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
22 Jan 198960.2DiedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Phan Thế Hinh
Bishop Joseph Phan Thế Hinh (born , died ) Bishop of Hưng Ha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHm Phu
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Church, Son Tay

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast