Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Joseph Cardinal Phạm Ðnh Tụng

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of H Nội, Viet Nam

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Regina Pacis in Ostia mare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1919Born
6 Jun 194929.9Ordained PriestPriest of H Ni, Viet Nam
5 Apr 196343.8AppointedBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
15 Aug 196344.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
5 Jul 199071.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of H Nội, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199474.7AppointedArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
26 Nov 199475.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Regina Pacis in Ostia mare
26 Nov 199475.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Feb 200585.6RetiredArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
22 Feb 200989.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of H Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Phạm Ðnh Tụng
Paul Joseph Cardinal Phạm Ðnh Tụng (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of H Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuang Nap, Yn M, Vicariate Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo}
Ordained BishopCathedral, H Nội, Archdiocese of H Nội
Death PlaceH Nội, Archdiocese of H Nội
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, H Nội, Archdiocese of H Nội

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast