Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Nair

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meerut, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1932Born
3 Oct 195927.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 197441.6AppointedBishop of Meerut, India
2 Oct 197442.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meerut, India
3 Dec 200876.3RetiredBishop of Meerut, India
7 Oct 201785.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Meerut, India

MicroData Summary for Patrick Nair
Bishop Patrick Nair (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meerut

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelhi
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Church, Meerut, Diocese of Meerut
Death PlaceMayath Indris Medical College, Hospital, Dehra Dun, Diocese of Meerut

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2008
  • d: CB, 9 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast