Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pascal N’Koué

Archbishop of Parakou, Benin

Apostolic Administrator of Djougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1959 Born
26 Jul 198627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Natitingou, Benin
28 Jun 199738.2AppointedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
21 Sep 199738.4Ordained BishopBishop of Natitingou, Benin
14 Jun 201152.2AppointedArchbishop of Parakou, Benin
3 Apr 201960.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Djougou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Pascal N’Koué
Archbishop Pascal N’Koué (born ) Archbishop of Parakou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoukombé
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Natitingou, Diocese of Natitingou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Parakou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,148
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • aadm: CB, 4 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast