Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprian Monis

Bishop Emeritus of Asansol, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1945 Born
21 Dec 197530.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 199448.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calcutta, India
26 Mar 199448.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Molicunza
4 Aug 199449.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Molicunza
24 Oct 199752.5AppointedBishop of Asansol, India
4 May 202075.0RetiredBishop of Asansol, India

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Monis
Bishop Cyprian Monis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Asansol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorna Halli, Diocese of Mysore
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St-Xavier School, West Bengal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Asansol.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,356
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast