Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jozef-Ernest Cardinal van Roey

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

Vicar Apostolic of Belgium, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1874Born
18 Sep 189723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
12 Mar 192652.1AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
25 Apr 192652.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
20 Jun 192753.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jun 192753.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
7 Sep 195783.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Belgium, Military
6 Aug 196187.5DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jozef-Ernest van Roey
Jozef-Ernest Cardinal van Roey (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVorselaar

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Jun 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 20
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 296, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 345, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 364, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 423, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 512, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 592, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 725, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,096, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast