Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Schioppa

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1871Born
10 Aug 192048.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
20 Aug 192048.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
22 Aug 192048.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
3 May 192553.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
12 Feb 192755.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Lithuania
30 Apr 192856.4ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Lithuania
23 Apr 193563.4DiedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Schioppa (VIAF: 89680990)
Archbishop Lorenzo Schioppa (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Netherlands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceAll'Aia

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 254
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 167, and Page 188, and Page 255
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 286, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast