Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karel Kmetko

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1875Born
2 Jul 189923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
16 Dec 192045.0AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
13 Feb 192145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
11 May 194468.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nitra, Slovakia
22 Dec 194873.0DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Karel Kmetko
Archbishop Karel Kmetko (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrzkovce Velké
Ordained BishopNitra, Diocese of Nitra

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast