Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alden John Bell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1904Born
14 May 193227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles-San Diego, California, USA
11 Apr 195651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
11 Apr 195651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodopolis
4 Jun 195651.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodopolis
30 Mar 196257.7AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
15 May 196257.8InstalledBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
11 Jul 197975.0RetiredBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
28 Aug 198278.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Alden John Bell
Bishop Alden John Bell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeterborough, Canada

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast