Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislav Lipovšek

Bishop Emeritus of Celje, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1943 Born
29 Jun 196824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Maribor, Slovenia
15 Mar 201066.6AppointedBishop of Celje, Slovenia
24 Apr 201066.7Ordained BishopBishop of Celje, Slovenia
31 Jul 201370.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Maribor, Slovenia
26 Apr 201571.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Maribor, Slovenia
18 Sep 201875.1RetiredBishop of Celje, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Lipovšek
Bishop Stanislav Lipovšek (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Celje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVojnik
Ordained BishopSaint Daniel, Cathedral, Celje, Diocese of Celje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Celje.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,633
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2018
  • aa: CB, 11 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast