Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislav (Stane) Zore, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1958 Born
4 Oct 198426.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Oct 201456.0AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
23 Nov 201456.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav (Stane) Zore
Archbishop Stanislav (Stane) Zore O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZnojile, Sela pri Kamniku
Ordained PriestLjubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana
Ordained Bishopsv. Nikolaja, Cathedral, Ljubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ljubljana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Oct 2014
  • c2+: CB, 22 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast