Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franc Kramberger

Archbishop Emeritus of Maribor, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1936 Born
29 Jun 196023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
6 Nov 198044.0AppointedBishop of Maribor, Slovenia
21 Dec 198044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Maribor, Slovenia
7 Apr 200669.5AppointedArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
24 Sep 200669.9InstalledArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
3 Feb 201174.3ResignedArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franc Kramberger
Archbishop Franc Kramberger (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maribor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLenart
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Maribor, Diocese of Maribor

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maribor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast