Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dražen Kutleša

Coadjutor Archbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1968 Born
13 Mar 199324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
29 Jun 199324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
17 Oct 201143.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
10 Dec 201143.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
14 Jun 201243.7SucceededBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
11 Jul 202051.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
3 Sep 202051.9InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Dražen Kutleša (VIAF: 89682776)
Archbishop Dražen Kutleša (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Split-Makarska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomislavgrad, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
Ordained BishopAssumption of Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Poreč, Diocese of Poreč i Pula

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Split-Makarska.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2011
  • od/c01: CB, 20 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,188
  • s: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2020
  • i: CB, 26 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast